+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- 4:21 PM 7/15/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/6 CHAPTER 56 SLA 16
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/16
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 257
- FN3: (REV)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 188(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, STOLTZE, ELLIS, GARDNER, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI
- MICCICHE, BISHOP, EGAN, STEVENS, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MEYER
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 188(FIN)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
- DP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
- NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: (REV)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 188(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ, TARR, JOSEPHSON, LYNN, DRUMMOND, TILTON, GATTIS, TUCK,
- JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 188(FIN)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- DP: SADDLER, KAWASAKI, GATTIS, PRUITT, WILSON, MUNOZ, GARA, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON,
- NEUMAN, THOMPSON
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: (REV)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: HUGHES, OLSON
- NR: CHENAULT, TILTON
- AM: LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON
- FN1: (REV)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor