+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 64 SLA 04
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 188
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y11 N8 E1
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 188
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2004
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS;
- JUD RPT 1DP 3NR
- NR: THERRIAULT, OGAN, ELLIS
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 188
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y31 N6 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 188
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2004
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- DP: COGHILL, WEYHRAUCH; DNP: HOLM;
- STA RPT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: SEATON, GRUENBERG, LYNN, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- AM: GATTO
- DAHLSTROM; NR: STEPOVICH, GUTTENBERG;
- DP: HEINZE, LYNN, KERTTULA, MASEK,
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR 1AM
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- RES, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor