+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/30/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/29 CHAPTER 33 SLA 03
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/7/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 187
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2003
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 187
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DEC)
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 187
- PASSED Y29 E10 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: HB 187
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (DEC)
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- CROFT, MOSES, CHENAULT, WHITAKER,
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE,
- FIN RPT 11DP
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (DEC)
- HEINZE, GATTO, LYNN, FATE
- DP: GUTTENBERG, WOLF, MASEK, MORGAN,
- RES RPT 8DP
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF LEG BUDGET & AUDIT
Type:
Primary Sponsor