+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 28, 2007 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 41 SLA 07
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/4/07
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:02 AM 6/13/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 186(FSH)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, STEDMAN, WILKEN, THERRIAULT, KOOKESH, THOMAS, WAGONER,
- COWDERY, HUGGINS, STEVENS
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- WAGONER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 186(FSH)
On May 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL ADDED
- STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: HUGGINS, WAGONER, MCGUIRE
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 186(FSH)
- PASSED Y32 E7 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, ROSES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 186(FSH)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(FSH) NT 6DP 2NR
- DP: ROSES, WILSON, SEATON, EDGMON, GATTO, JOHNSON
- NR: KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON, JOHNSON, WILSON
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: JOHNSON, LEDOUX, EDGMON, SEATON
- NR: JOHANSEN, HOLMES
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
HARRIS BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor