+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/6 CHAPTER 1 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/18
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- 1:00 PM 3/2/18 RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE AS PER REQUEST
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- 3:24 PM 2/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/24/2018
- FN2: ZERO(DEC) (UPDATED FOR 2018)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 186
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, EGAN, BEGICH, OLSON, HUGHES, BISHOP, COSTELLO
- MACKINNON, KELLY
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 186
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 5DP
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MICCICHE, GARDNER
On April 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 186
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON, JOSEPHSON, FANSLER, GARA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 186
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- HSS RPT 7DP
- DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, EASTMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KOPP
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor