+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN4: (DFG)
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: TILTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- DP: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6DP
- DP: TALERICO, STORY, CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, GILLIS, STUTES
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (ADM)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- FN2: (ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: NEUMAN
- DP: KOPP, EDGMON, TARR, STUTES
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP 1NR
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- FSH, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20