+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, MILLETT
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COGHILL
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- STA REFERRAL REMOVED
- STA, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS