+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- TECHNICAL CORRECTION
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 81 SLA 01
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A4
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: TAYLOR, COWDERY; NR: ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 5/7/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 184(JUD)
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 184(JUD)
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y17 N20 E2 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/01
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N22 E2 A1
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y33 N5 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 184(JUD)
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DAVIES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 E2 A3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 184(JUD) AM
On April 29, 2001 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 3NR 1AM
- COGHILL, OGAN; AM: BERKOWITZ
- DP: JAMES, ROKEBERG; NR: MEYER,
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 27, 2001 in the House:
- L&C CS RECEIVED NT
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- KOTT, MEYER, ROKEBERG; AM: CRAWFORD
- DP: HAYES, MURKOWSKI; NR: HALCRO,
- L&C RPT FORTHCOMING CS(L&C) 2DP 4NR 1AM
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor