+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 24, 2011 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/24/11
- 1:50 PM 6/7/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/23 CHAPTER 24 SLA 11
On April 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2011
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 183(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 183(FIN) AM
On April 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 183(FIN) AM
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 A3
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2011
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 183(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, MUNOZ, PETERSEN, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, HERRON, EDGMON, JOULE, FOSTER
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- DP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH, COSTELLO, EDGMON, NEUMAN, T.WILSON,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: GARDNER
- DP: DICK, AUSTERMAN, FOSTER, SADDLER, MUNOZ
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 5DP 1NR
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor