+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 182(STA)
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX, HANNAN, STORY, WOOL
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 182(STA)
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 11DP
- DP: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, WOOL, JOSEPHSON,
- SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FN2: (DPS)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
- DP: VANCE, HOPKINS, THOMPSON, SHAW, STORY, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: (DPS)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor