+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/9 CHAPTER 14 SLA 08
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/8/08
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- 10:35 AM 3/25/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 182(JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 182(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, ELTON, WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT 3DP
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: ELLIS, BUNDE, DAVIS, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 4DP
On April 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, KERTTULA, GARA
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 182(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2007
- VERSION: CSHB 182(JUD)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GRUENBERG
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, BUCH, NEUMAN, RAMRAS, GARDNER, LEDOUX
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: GARDNER, LEDOUX, BUCH, NEUMAN, GATTO, RAMRAS, OLSON
- L&C RPT 7DP
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor