+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: P.WILSON
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 182(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TUCK, HOLMES, GARDNER
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 182(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2012
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- AM: NEUMAN
- NR: EDGMON, DOOGAN
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
- AM: KELLER, GRUENBERG, SEATON
- DP: P.WILSON, PETERSEN, JOHANSEN, LYNN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 3AM
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor