+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- 4:27 PM 6/21/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 63 SLA 05
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/05
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: SEEKINS, STEVENS B, HUGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 181(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, DYSON, OLSON, WILKEN, THERRIAULT, GUESS, ELLIS,
- KOOKESH, DAVIS, FRENCH, WAGONER, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, COWDERY, STEVENS G,
- HOFFMAN
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 181(L&C)
On April 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: THERRIAULT, ELTON, WAGONER, HUGGINS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On April 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 181(L&C)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS, CROFT, GRUENBERG, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 181(L&C)
On April 19, 2005 in the House:
- CORRECTED L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP 1NR
- DP: GUTTENBERG, LYNN, LEDOUX, KOTT;
- NR: ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(MLV) 5DP
- DP: LYNN, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG, KOTT
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
- DP: THOMAS, GRUENBERG, CISSNA, ELKINS, MCGUIRE, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, L&C
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor