+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- FN4: (CC:HB284/ADM)
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
On April 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN3: (ADM)
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, MEYER, GIESSEL, PASKVAN
- STA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- DAVIS, THOMAS, STEDMAN, KOOKESH, MCGUIRE, STEVENS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN,
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: (ADM)(CORRECTED)
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 180(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLER, HOLMES, TUCK, JOHNSON, MILLETT, PRUITT, KAWASAKI
- VERSION: CSHB 180(FIN)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, GUTTENBERG, GARA, JOULE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, THOMAS, KERTTULA
- STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN3: (ADM)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, COSTELLO
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GRUENBERG
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- FN2: (ADM)
- AM: JOHANSEN, P.WILSON
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 2AM
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
- FN1: (ADM)
- DNP: AUSTERMAN
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MILLER, SADDLER, THOMPSON
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 5DP 1DNP
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor