+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/11 CHAPTER 32 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/9/00
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 4/26/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/18/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 180(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 2NR
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, PETE KELLY,
- ADAMS, WILKEN, LEMAN;
- NR: GREEN, DONLEY
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN (ADM)
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: TAYLOR, HALFORD, TORGERSON;
- NR: ELLIS
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FNS (LAW #4, COR)
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 6 FLD Y17 N20 E3
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N11 E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 180(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y25 N11 E4
- SMALLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N23 E1
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N25 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 4DNP 3NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, FOSTER;
- DNP: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, DAVIS;
- NR: BUNDE, AUSTERMAN, PHILLIPS
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- 2 INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTES (COR, LAW)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
On May 3, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, JAMES; NR: CROFT,
- MURKOWSKI, ROKEBERG, KERTTULA
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.JUD)
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD, FIN