+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (57)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 11:08 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 94 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- DYSON, SEEKINS, DAVIS
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y16 N22 E2
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N20
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- MCGUIRE (CHAIR), MEYER, GRUENBERG
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 18
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y17 N3 CCS HB 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- CC RPT ADOPTED Y37 E2 A1 CCS HB 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 18(HES)
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 18(HES)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES SCS ADOPTED Y14 N5 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 4DP TECH TITLE CH
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, GUESS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 18(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y27 N1 E3 A9
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 E3 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 18(JUD) AM
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1AM
- DP: OGG, HOLM, SAMUELS, MCGUIRE;
- AM: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM; NR: SEATON, HOLM,
- BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH; AM: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD