+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
On April 21, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATES PASSED Y35 N4 A1
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y24 N15 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 179(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y26 N13 A1
- PASSED Y24 N15 A1 CSHB 179(FIN) AM
- EFFECTIVE DATES PASSED Y36 N3 A1
- MARTIN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 3DNP 1NR 1AM
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, BROWN, FOSTER
- DNR: MARTIN, PARNELL, THERRIAULT
- NR: GRUSSENDORF
- AM: HANLEY
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 4/15/93
On March 17, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/17/93
- DP: MACKIE, MULDER, WILLIAMS, GREEN
- DP: PORTER, HUDSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 4NR
On February 24, 1993 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor