+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
- 8:30 AM 6/12/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 30 SLA 09
On April 19, 2009 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C) AM S
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C) AM S
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS
- L&C RPT 4DP
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C)
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2009
On April 11, 2009 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 4NR
- NR: AUSTERMAN, CRAWFORD, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, KELLY, HAWKER, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: LYNN, BUCH, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, HOLMES
- DP: COGHILL, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 5NR
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor