+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 24, 2016 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 4 SLA 16
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/16
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- 2:34 PM 4/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 175
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, KELLY, COGHILL, STEVENS, MICCICHE, EGAN, STEDMAN
- MEYER
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 175
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, MCGUIRE
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/25/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 175
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER, COLVER, OLSON, GARA, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 175
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- DP: TALERICO, STUTES, VAZQUEZ, GRUENBERG, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, VAZQUEZ
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor