+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
On April 16, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 N- E3 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 175
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/93
On April 8, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- NR: MARTIN
- DP: LARSON, MACLEAN, HANLEY, PARNELL
- DP: THERRIAULT, FOSTER
On March 30, 1993 in the House:
- DP: VEZEY,B.DAVIS,OLBERG,KOTT,SANDERS
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 19, 1993 in the House:
- DP: WILLIS, MULDER, FOSTER, KOTT
- MLV RPT 4DP
On February 24, 1993 in the House:
- MLV, STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)