+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- TRA RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: COWDERY, TAYLOR; NR: WILKEN
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 3, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT CS(2D FIN) NT 9DP 1NR
- LANCASTER, HUDSON, FOSTER, MULDER,
- WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/02
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, DAVIES, MOSES,
- 2D FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(2D FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 175(2D FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On March 25, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- RETURNED TO FIN COMMITTEE
On April 27, 2001 in the House:
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, LANCASTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 4NR
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
- FOSTER, MULDER, WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE,
- CROFT, DAVIES, HUDSON
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- MURKOWSKI
- NR: MEYER; AM: HALCRO, CRAWFORD,
- DP: KOTT, HAYES; DNP: ROKEBERG;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 1DNP 1NR 3AM
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS