+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 1/1/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 75 SLA 93
- 1:20 PM 6/3/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 171(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/93
On May 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN (DHSS)
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN (DHSS)
- HES RPT 5NR
On April 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/93
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 171(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
On March 30, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS FN (DHSS) 3/22/93
- DP:GRUSSENDORF,NAVARRE,THERRIAULT,FOSTER
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, MARTIN, PARNELL
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP
On March 22, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/22/93
- DP:KOTT,VEZEY,GDAVIS,TOOHEY,OLBERG,BRICE
- HES RPT 6DP
On February 22, 1993 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor