+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 38 SLA 03
- 3:55 PM 6/2/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 170(EFD FLD S)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y11 N9
- PASSED Y12 N8
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 170
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (ADM)
- DNP: HOFFMAN, OLSON; NR: TAYLOR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT 4DP 2DNP 1NR
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 170
- PASSED Y23 N17
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y26 N14
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N17
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N13
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 170
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N27 E2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2003
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2DNP 3NR
- DP: HAWKER, WHITAKER, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- DNP: STOLTZE, CROFT; NR: MEYER, JOULE,
- CHENAULT
- FN1: (ADM)
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (ADM)
- DP: HOLM; NR: FATE, OGG, MASEK
- TRA RPT 1DP 3NR
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: (ADM)
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor