+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- WITHDRAWN FROM RULES REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FINANCE REFERRAL ADDED
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- UPDATED H ZERO FN PUBLISHED (CED)
- JUD RPT 3DP
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DCED)
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- LABOR AND COMMERCE, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 170
- PASSED Y36 N- E1 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 13, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED) 3/31/93
- DP: PARNELL, BROWN, FOSTER
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HANLEY, MARTIN
- FIN RPT 7DP
On March 31, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/31/93
- DP: WILLIAMS, HUDSON
- DP: PORTER, SITTON, MACKIE, MULDER
- L&C RPT 6DP
On February 22, 1993 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor