+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER
On March 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- L&C UPDATED (2012 FORMAT) FISCAL NOTES
- FN5: ZERO(DEC)
- FN6: ZERO(DFG)
- FN7: ZERO(LAW)
- FN8: ZERO(DNR)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: GIESSEL, MENARD
- NR: EGAN, DAVIS, PASKVAN
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 168(JUD)
- PASSED Y33 N6 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MILLETT, HAWKER, LYNN, OLSON, SADDLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 168(JUD)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2NR
- DP: KELLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON
- NR: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER, THOMPSON
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S) CORRECTED: ADD THOMAS; REMOVE KELLER
- BILL REPRINTED 2/24/11
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor