+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT SCS(TRA) 3DP SAME TITLE
- DP: MYERS, KIEHL, MICCICHE
- FN2: (ADM)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 166(FIN)
- PASSED Y29 N10 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 166(FIN)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED
- CALL FOR THE QUESTION UC
- AM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y1 N36 E3
- CALL FOR THE QUESTION AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N32 E3 A1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
- MOTION TO TABLE FAILED Y3 N34 E3
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: LEBON, JOHNSON, EDGMON
- DNP: JOSEPHSON
- NR: ORTIZ, WOOL, MERRICK
- FN2: (ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, THOMPSON, CARPENTER, GILLHAM
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- TRA RPT 2DP 2DNP 3NR
- DP: MCKAY, MCCABE
- DNP: HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: CRONK, DRUMMOND, HOPKINS
- FN1: (ADM)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
+ − Amendments (5)
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
AM 1 to AM 1
AM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y1 N36 E3
AM 2
AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N32 E3 A1
AM 3
AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
AM 4
AM NO 4 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor