+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 165
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, GUTTENBERG, JOSEPHSON, FANSLER, LEDOUX
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y39 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 165
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2017
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, EASTMAN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, PARISH, TUCK
- MLV RPT 4DP
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor