+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:00 P.M. 8/4/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 61 SLA 22
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 163 AM S(EFD ADD S)
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/18/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HB 163 AM S(EFD ADD S)
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR RECEIVED AND HELD
- LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y29 N10 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: HB 163
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 163
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y40
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- CLAMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEBON
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN, ORTIZ, PRAX, MCKAY, THOMPSON, VANCE, MCCARTY, CRONK,
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FOSTER
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK,
- FIN RPT 9DP
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT 3DP 4NR
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
- NR: EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- DP: MCCABE, PRAX, MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, SCHRAGE, HANNAN
- CRA RPT 6DP
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor