+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 112 SLA 10
- 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 162(RES)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 162(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: OLSON, ELLIS
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 4DP 2NR
On April 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, WAGONER, STEDMAN, STEVENS, HUGGINS
- RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: FRENCH
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 162
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 162
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: GARA, CRAWFORD, KELLY, SALMON, STOLTZE
- DP: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, JOULE
- FIN RPT 5DP 5NR
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: OLSON, EDGMON, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
- RES RPT 7DP 1AM
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor