+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 3:27 PM 6/12/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 47 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/14
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 E1 A2
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 161(RES) AM S
- PASSED Y16 N4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 161(RES) AM S
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, MCGUIRE
- NR: FRENCH, MICCICHE, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 161(RES)
- PASSED Y29 N6 E5
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 N5 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 161(RES)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP
- DP: JOHNSON, OLSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: HIGGINS
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HIGGINS
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, MILLETT, HOLMES
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, COSTELLO
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor