+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 36 SLA 14
- FN1: (CED)
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:19 PM 6/13/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E2 A5
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 160(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER
- PASSED Y18 N2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 160(FIN)
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 1DNP 1NR TECH TITLE CHG (EFD ADDED)
- DNP: DUNLEAVY
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: OLSON
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 160(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014
- PASSED Y35 N1 E1 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 160(FIN)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP 1NR
- DP: GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, NEUMAN, GARA, MUNOZ, EDGMON, HOLMES, COSTELLO,
- STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- NR: T.WILSON
- FN1: (CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD
- DP: MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT 4DP 3NR
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (6)
THOMPSON BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor