+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (91)
On May 8, 1994 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/7 CHAPTER 28 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/5/94
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- 2:23 PM 4/20/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N- E2 A4
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FNS PUBLISHED (COURT, LAW))
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RET TO 2ND TO RESCIND ACTION FLD Y10 N10
- RET TO 2ND FOR AM 9 FLD Y9 N11
- RET TO 2ND TO RESCIND ACTION FLD Y8 N12
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE FAILED Y13 N7
- RESCIND ACTION IN PASSING FLD Y9 N11
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/94
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 160 AM S
- MTN RTN TO 2ND AM 5-8 & HOLD WITHDRAWN
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 Y13 N5 A2
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y11 N7 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 Y11 N7 A2
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N12 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 7 Y13 N5 A2
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y7 N11 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- MOTION TO RETURN AND AM 8 WITHDRAWN
- RET TO 2ND TO RESCIND AM 1 FLD Y9 N9 A2
- FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N7 A3
- MILLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On January 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 1/10/94 CALENDAR
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE
On September 14, 1993 in the Senate:
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
On May 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- RESCIND PREVIOUS ACTION Y11 N9
- RETURN TO RULES FAILED Y9 N11
- BEFORE SENATE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N11
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- AM NO 4 MOVED & WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y12 N8
- THIRD READING 5/11/93 CALENDAR
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 5/9/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE Y11 N9
- RESCIND MOTION HELD TO 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE AUTHORIZED BY SCR 10
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS APPLY TO SCS
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On April 22, 1993 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N12 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 21, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 160
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y19 N18 A3
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY FINKELSTEIN (TITLE AM)
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y27 N11 A2 HB 160(TITLE AM)
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- SITTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY BROWN
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N26
- AMENDMENT NO 2 BY BROWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y17 N23
- AMENDMENT NO 3 BY BROWN
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y20 N20
- AMENDMENT NO 4 BY NORDLUND
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y18 N22
- AMENDMENT NO 5 BY BROWN
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y17 N23
- FAILED TO ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG Y25 N15
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/21 CALENDAR
On March 29, 1993 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP 2DNP
- DP: JAMES, KOTT, PORTER, PHILLIPS
- DNP: NORDLUND, DAVIDSON
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (COURT, LAW) 3/3/93
On March 3, 1993 in the House:
- L&C RPT 5DP
- DP: PORTER, HUDSON,SITTON,WILLIAMS,GREEN
- -2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (COURT, LAW) 3/3/93
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR CORRECTIONS: PHILLIPS, LARSON
- HUDSON, PORTER, BUNDE
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE, JUDICIARY
- COSPONSOR(S): VEZEY, MULDER
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor