+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/2 CHAPTER 6 SLA 11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/31/11
On April 30, 2011 in the House:
- 3:40 PM 4/30/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 16(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 16(FIN)
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN3: (DHS) CORRECTED
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 12
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS
- FN4: (DHS)
- FN5: (DHS)
- FN6: (DHS)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 5DP
- DP: DAVIS, DYSON, MEYER, EGAN, ELLIS
- FN2: (DHS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, ELLIS, PASKVAN, EGAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE,
- OLSON, HUGGINS, WAGONER, GIESSEL, DYSON, FRENCH, MENARD
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT 10DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, NEUMAN, EDGMON, DOOGAN,
- STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN2: (DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/31/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 16
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, KERTTULA, DOOGAN, JOULE, SEATON, GRUENBERG, OLSON, MUNOZ,
- GUTTENBERG, MILLER, GARDNER, STOLTZE, JOHANSEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 16
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- HSS RPT 6DP
- DP: MILLETT, DICK, SEATON, MILLER, HERRON, KELLER
- FN1: (DHS)
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, KAWASAKI, JOHNSON
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor