+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FINANCE
On May 9, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y34 N6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 159(FIN) AM
On May 8, 1997 in the House:
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (COURT, DCED) 4/17/97
- DP: MULDER, KOHRING; DNP: MARTIN, FOSTER
- NR: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, GRUSSENDORF,
- DAVIS; AM: DAVIES
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 2DNP 4NR 1AM
- 4 ZERO FNS (DPS, REV, LAW, ADM) 4/17/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N15 A3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y10 N30
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/09 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/97
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- NR: JAMES, BUNDE, BERKOWITZ, CROFT
- DP: ROKEBERG, PORTER, GREEN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (COURT, DCED) 4/17/97
- 4 ZERO FNS (DPS, REV, LAW, ADM) 4/17/97
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On April 17, 1997 in the House:
- 4 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, REV, LAW, ADM)
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (COURT, DCED)
- NR: BRICE; AM: ROKEBERG
- DP: COWDERY, SANDERS, RYAN, HUDSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1NR 1AM
On April 11, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COWDERY
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- L&C, JUDICIARY
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SANDERS
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)