+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: (HSS)
- DP: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, GREEN
- STA RPT 3DP
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, GREEN, DYSON, MCGUIRE
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 159(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/30
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 159(JUD)
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: (HSS)
- NR: CRAWFORD, CHENAULT
- DP: THOMAS, NELSON, KELLY, MEYER
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- FN1: (HSS)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On March 16, 2007 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN1: (HSS)
- NR: NEUMAN, GARDNER, SEATON
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, ROSES, WILSON
- HES RPT CS(HES) 3DP 3NR
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS