+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 158(FIN)
- PASSED Y24 N11 E2 A2 V1
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y25 N12 E2 V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 158(FIN)
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/10 - ON 4/11 CALENDAR
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 3DNP 2NR
- DP: T.WILSON, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH, NEUMAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS,
- DNP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, DOOGAN
- NR: JOULE, EDGMON
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- TRA RPT 4NR 2AM
- NR: FEIGE, PRUITT, PETERSEN, GRUENBERG
- AM: MUNOZ, P.WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor