+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE RLS
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- FN3: (EED/FUND CAP)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: TALERICO, RAUSCHER, SADDLER, FANSLER, PARISH
- DP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 2DP 5NR
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, CLAMAN
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor