+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: (DNR)
- NR: JOSEPHSON, WOOL, JOHNSON, ORTIZ, LEBON
- DP: RASMUSSEN, EDGMON, THOMPSON, MERRICK
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 4DP 5NR
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, RASMUSSEN
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- DP: SCHRAGE, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS, CRONK, FIELDS, MCKAY, PATKOTAK
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: GILLHAM
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON, MCCABE
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER, RAUSCHER
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
- L&C REFERRAL REMOVED
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- L&C, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor