+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On September 15, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/19 CHAPTER 92 SLA 05
- 1:45 PM 8/10/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, DYSON, STEDMAN
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
On April 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- AM: GREEN
- NR: ELTON, OLSON
- DP: DYSON
- HES RPT 1DP 2NR 1AM
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 4DP 1NR
- DP: KOHRING, COGHILL, KERTTULA, ROKEBERG;
- NR: HARRIS
- VERSION: CSHB 156(RLS) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2005
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 156(RLS) AM
- PASSED Y33 E7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: HAWKER, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, CROFT, KELLY, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT CS(HES) NT 8DP
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, ANDERSON, KOHRING, MCGUIRE, SEATON, WILSON
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 7DP
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor