+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 156
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N27 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y34 N3 E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 156
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, COSTELLO
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- L&C RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: CHENAULT, SADDLER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, OLSON
- NR: HOLMES, MILLER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: HOLMES
- BILL REPRINTED 2/16/11
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor