+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/03
- 8:30 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 50 SLA 03
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 154(FIN)(EFD FLD S)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y6 Y13 A1
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N7 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y12 N8
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 154(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: (EED)
- DNP: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: WILKEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT 4DP 2DNP
On May 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 154(FIN)
- PASSED Y26 N8 E5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 E5 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 154(FIN)
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2003
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: (EED)
- HAWKER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- NR: CHENAULT, CROFT, JOULE, STOLTZE,
- DP: FOSTER, WHITAKER, MEYER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 7NR
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(EDU) NT 4DP 2DNP
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: COGHILL, WOLF, GATTO, WILSON;
- DNP: KAPSNER, CISSNA
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- DNP: GARA, KAPSNER; NR: WOLF
- DP: WILSON, COGHILL, SEATON, GATTO;
- EDU RPT CS(EDU) NT 4DP 2DNP 1NR
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: (EED)
- EDU, HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor