+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 21 SLA 14
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 11:17 AM 6/12/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 154(EDC)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 154(EDC)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EDC SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- EDC RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS, GARDNER, STEDMAN, DUNLEAVY
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- 785
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 154(EDC)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KERTTULA, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 154(EDC)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: SADDLER
- DP: SEATON, REINBOLD, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX, GATTIS
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP 1NR
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS