+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: ZERO(AJS)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2016
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 154
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KITO, TARR, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 154
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, LEDOUX
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: PRUITT, WILSON
- DP: SADDLER, GARA, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, MUNOZ, THOMPSON
- FIN RPT 6DP 2NR 1AM
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- DP: CLAMAN, LYNN, FOSTER, KELLER, GRUENBERG, LEDOUX
- JUD RPT 6DP
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor