+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/09/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/11 CHAPTER 26 SLA 95
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- 9:40 AM 4/28/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 151
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/95
On April 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (COURT)
- JUD RPT 3DP
On March 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 151
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/95
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- JUD RPT 7DP
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
- DP: VEZEY, FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- DP: PORTER, GREEN, BUNDE, TOOHEY
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor