+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 9:20 AM 7/8/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 136 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 E3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 151(L&C)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 151(L&C)
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- BILL NOT TAKEN UP 5/17-ON 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP
- DP: OGAN, ELLIS, FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, STEVENS G;
- NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 151(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 151(JUD) AM
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2NR
- DP: GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE;
- NR: HOLM, OGG
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor