+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (74)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- FN11: (DHS)
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 15 SLA 18
- FN12: (DHS)
- 2:08 PM 6/6/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX, KOPP
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E1 A1
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 151(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, STEVENS, BISHOP
- COSTELLO, HOFFMAN, GARDNER, HUGHES, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, COGHILL
- MEYER, VON IMHOF
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 151(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- FISCAL INFORMATION FORTHCOMING
- FN12: (DHS)
- FN11: (DHS)
- NR: MICCICHE
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- DP: BEGICH, GIESSEL
- HSS RPT SCS 2DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
- AM: WILSON
- NR: VON IMHOF
- FN12: (DHS)
- FISCAL INFORMATION FORTHCOMING
- FN11: (DHS)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 151(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 N1 A1
- PASSED Y23 N17
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 151(FIN)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 1NR 4AM
- DP: ORTIZ, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
- AM: TILTON, THOMPSON, KAWASAKI, WILSON
- NR: GUTTENBERG
- FN9: (DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- FN10: (DHS)
On April 16, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND, PARISH, FANSLER, TUCK, GRENN, ORTIZ
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
- DP: TARR, EDGMON, SPOHNHOLZ
- DNP: EASTMAN
- NR: KITO
- AM: JOHNSTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- FN4: (DHS)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN3: (DHS)
- FN5: (DHS)
- FN6: (DHS)
- FN7: (DHS)
- FN8: (DHS)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor