+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (77)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 55 SLA 04
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 15(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- STEDMAN, GUESS, COWDERY, THERRIAULT
- LINCOLN, ELTON, WAGONER, SEEKINS,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 15(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, FRENCH, DYSON,
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN5: (LAW)
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN5: (LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH; NR: OGAN
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN5: (LAW)
- DP: SEEKINS
- NR: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 15(FIN) AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
- PASSED Y35 N1 E2 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 15(FIN) AM
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, GUTTENBERG
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/3
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2004
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- DP: HAWKER, CROFT, CHENAULT, FATE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3NR
- FN5: (LAW)
- MEYER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE,
- JOULE, MOSES
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- FN3: (LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HOLM, LYNN, DAHLSTROM, BERKOWITZ
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, WEYHRAUCH;
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 4NR
- FN2: (LAW)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- DP: CRAWFORD, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 4AM
- FN2: (LAW)
- AM: LYNN, GATTO, GUTTENBERG, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor