+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, RES, FIN
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N20 E3
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N2 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 15(RES)
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/22/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: ZERO(DFG) (UPDATED FROM RULES)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW) (UPDATED FROM RULES)
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 15(RES)
- PASSED Y33 N2 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 3NR
- DP: SEATON, KOHRING, EDGMON, WILSON, ROSES, GATTO
- NR: GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, JOHNSON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On May 5, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 2DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: LEDOUX, SEATON
- NR: JOHNSON, HOLMES, EDGMON
- AM: WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/5/07
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES