+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (74)
On October 16, 2024 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE REVISED 10/15
On October 9, 2024 in the House:
- 2:10 P.M. 6/20/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 4 SLA 24
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268
- FN4: (EED)
- FN5: (EED)
- FN6: (EED)
- FN8: (EED)
- FN9: (EED)
- FN10: (LWF)
- FN12: (LWF)
- FN14: (UA)
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N12
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y20
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 148(FIN) AM S
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 148(FIN) AM S
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND TAKEN UP
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
- CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y39 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 5DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
- DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
- AM: WILSON
- FN4: (EED)
- FN5: (EED)
- FN6: (EED)
- FN8: (EED)
- FN9: (EED)
- FN10: (LWF)
- FN11: (LWF)
- FN12: (LWF)
- FN13: (REV)
- FN14: (UA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On February 26, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 148(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 148(FIN)
On February 23, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/26 CALENDAR
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP 1NR
- DP: CRONK, STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, COULOMBE, ORTIZ, FOSTER, D.JOHNSON,
- EDGMON
- NR: TOMASZEWSKI
- FN4: (EED)
- FN5: (EED)
- FN6: (EED)
- FN7: (EED)
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 6DP
- DP: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, MCKAY, MCCORMICK, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- FN2: (EED)
- FN3: (EED)
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC, FIN
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor