+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 146(JUD)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 - Y32 N2 E4 A2
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N21 E4 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y30 N5 E4 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 146(JUD)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- DP: FIELDS, STUTES, STORY, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: GILLIS
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP
- DP: STUTES, DRUMMOND, KOPP, CLAMAN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, L&C
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, L&C
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N21 E4 A1